House
|
04/02/2025
|
House sustained Governor's veto
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/03/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2264ER)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Impact statement from TAX (HB2264)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Passed by temporarily
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 2nd reading) (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (63-Y 36-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Printed as engrossed 25104449D-E
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Engrossed by House as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Finance Amendments agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Assigned Approps sub: General Government and Capital Outlay
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2025
|
Reported from Finance with amendment(s) and referred to Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2025
|
Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25104449D
|
|
|