House
|
04/02/2025
|
House sustained Governor's veto
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/11/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2276)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2276ER)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Conference report agreed to by House (54-Y 41-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Conference substitute printed 25107986D-H2
|
|
|
|
02/21/2025
|
Amended by conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Senators: VanValkenburg, Carroll Foy, Salim
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Conferees appointed by Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Delegates: Price, Sickles, Bloxom
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Conferees appointed by House
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
House acceded to request
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate requested conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Senate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 18-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 18-N 1-A)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Finance and Appropriations Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Reading of substitute waived
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 2nd reading) (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25107698D-S1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported from Privileges and Elections and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 7-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (56-Y 42-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Engrossed by House - committee substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Privileges and Elections Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 5-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2025
|
Assigned Approps sub: General Government and Capital Outlay
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25105975D-H1
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute and referred to Appropriations (13-Y 8-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25101670D
|
|
|