|
03/19/2025
|
Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2025
|
Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (Effective 07/01/26 )
|
|
|
|
03/03/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2472)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2472ER)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 2nd reading) (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Passed House (51-Y 46-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (56-Y 41-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Moved from Uncontested Calendar to Regular Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Printed as engrossed 25102079D-E
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Engrossed by House as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Courts of Justice Amendments agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25102079D
|
|
|