Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Reported from Commerce and Labor and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 6-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2509)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (52-Y 46-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Engrossed by House - committee substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Labor and Commerce Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2025
|
Assigned Approps sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25105013D-H1
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute and referred to Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute and referring to Appropriations (6-Y 4-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25102641D
|
|
|