Virginia 2025 Regular Session

Virginia House Bill HB2558 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-OFFERED FOR CONSIDERATION 1/27/2025
1+2025 SESSION
2+
3+INTRODUCED
4+
5+25102664D
26
37 HOUSE BILL NO. 2558
48
5-AMENDMENT IN THE NATURE OF A SUBSTITUTE
9+Offered January 13, 2025
610
7-(Proposed by the House Committee on Finance
8-
9-on ________________)
10-
11-(Patron Prior to SubstituteDelegate Lopez)
11+Prefiled January 12, 2025
1212
1313 A BILL to amend the Code of Virginia by adding in Title 58.1 a chapter numbered 6.3, consisting of sections numbered 58.1-663 through 58.1-666, relating to retail sales and use tax; firearm and ammunition taxes.
14+
15+
16+
17+PatronLopez
18+
19+
20+
21+Committee Referral Pending
1422
1523
1624
1725 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of Virginia:
1826
1927 1. That the Code of Virginia is amended by adding in Title 58.1 a chapter numbered 6.3, consisting of sections numbered 58.1-663 through 58.1-666, as follows:
2028
2129 CHAPTER 6.3.
2230
2331 FIREARM AND AMMUNITION TAXES.
2432
2533 58.1-663. Definitions.
2634
2735 As used in this chapter:
2836
2937 "Dealer" means the same as that term is defined in 18.2-308.2:2.
3038
3139 "Firearm" means any handgun, shotgun, rifle, or other firearm that will, is designed to, or may readily be converted to explode a combustible material to expel single or multiple projectiles.
3240
3341 "Firearm ammunition" means ammunition or cartridge cases, primers, bullets, propellant powder, or other projectiles designed for use in any firearm.
3442
3543 "Firearm seller" means (i) a dealer that sells a firearm or firearm ammunition, (ii) a seller of a firearm or firearm ammunition at any event noticed as a firearms show as required by 54.1-4201.1, or (iii) any other person who sells a firearm or firearm ammunition within the Commonwealth.
3644
3745 "Law-enforcement officer" means the same as that term is defined in 9.1-101.
3846
3947 58.1-664. Imposition of firearm and ammunition taxes; exceptions.
4048
41-A. 1. There is hereby levied and imposed on firearm sellers, in addition to all other taxes and fees imposed by law, a firearm tax in the amount of $5 per firearm that is sold or resold. No discount under 58.1-622 shall be allowed for the tax imposed under this chapter.
49+A. 1. Beginning July 1, 2025, there is hereby levied and imposed on firearm sellers, in addition to all other taxes and fees imposed by law, a firearm tax in the amount of $5 per firearm that is sold or resold. No discount under 58.1-622 shall be allowed for the tax imposed under this chapter.
4250
43-2. There is hereby levied and imposed on firearm sellers, in addition to all other taxes and fees imposed by law, a firearm ammunition tax in the amount of one cent per round of firearm ammunition that is sold or resold. No discount under 58.1-622 shall be allowed for the tax imposed under this chapter.
51+2. Beginning July 1, 2025, there is hereby levied and imposed on firearm sellers, in addition to all other taxes and fees imposed by law, a firearm ammunition tax in the amount of one cent per round of firearm ammunition that is sold or resold. No discount under 58.1-622 shall be allowed for the tax imposed under this chapter.
4452
4553 B. The taxes imposed pursuant to this chapter shall not apply to the sale of any firearms or firearm ammunition to a federal, state, or local agency or to a law-enforcement officer for use in the normal course of his employment.
4654
47-C. The taxes levied under this chapter shall be collected by the Tax Commissioner in the same manner as is the retail sales and use tax pursuant to Chapter 6 ( 58.1-600 et seq.). The Tax Commissioner shall develop guidelines implementing the provisions of this chapter. Such guidelines shall be exempt from the provisions of the Administrative Process Act ( 2.2-4000 et seq.).
55+C. The taxes levied under this chapter shall be collected by the Tax Commissioner in the same manner as is the retail sales and use tax pursuant to Chapter 6 ( 58.1-600 et seq.).
4856
4957 58.1-665. Disposition of revenue; allowable uses.
5058
5159 A. The Department shall distribute the proceeds received from the taxes levied on all sales, including remote sales, of firearms and firearm ammunition in the Commonwealth pursuant to 58.1-664 in the following manner: (i) 50 percent of the revenues shall be remitted to localities pro rata in an amount proportional to the amount of revenues derived from such locality for local public school safety initiatives and local gun violence prevention purposes and (ii) 50 percent of the revenues shall be deposited into the Virginia Gun Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund, as established pursuant to 9.1-116.6.
5260
5361 B. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, revenue distributed pursuant to this section shall only be used for the purposes of providing additional funding to enhance public school safety and prevent gun violence.
5462
5563 58.1-666. Provisions of Chapter 6 of this title to apply, mutatis mutandis.
5664
5765 The provisions of Chapter 6 ( 58.1-600 et seq.) shall apply to this chapter, mutatis mutandis, except as herein provided.
58-
59-2. That the provisions of this act shall become effective on July 1, 2026.