House | 02/04/2025 | Left in Courts of Justice | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2654) | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Impact statement from VCSC (HB2654) | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Presented and ordered printed 25105054D |