Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 2-N 1-A)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25107323D-S1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from Education and Health with substitute and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Assigned Education sub: Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Education and Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB2714)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Printed as engrossed 25102100D-E
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Engrossed by House as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Health and Human Services Amendment agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Reported from Health and Human Services with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) and referring to Appropriations (8-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Assigned sub: Behavioral Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Presented and ordered printed 25102100D
|
|
|