House | 11/18/2024 | Left in Courts of Justice | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Continued to 2025 with amendment(s) in Courts of Justice (Voice Vote) | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Impact statement from DPB (HB347) | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Continued to 2025 with amendment(s) in Courts of Justice by voice vote | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 with amendment(s) by voice vote | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assigned Courts sub: Civil | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102461D |