House | 11/18/2024 | Left in Finance | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Continued to 2025 in Finance (Voice Vote) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Finance | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103542D |