House | 11/18/2024 | Left in Public Safety | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Continued to 2025 with substitute in Public Safety (Voice Vote) | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Continued to 2025 with substitute in Public Safety by voice vote | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Committee substitute posted to LIS only 24107451D-H1 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 with substitute by voice vote | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Public Safety | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101949D |