House | 03/12/2025 | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ446ER) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Read third time | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Passed by for the day | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Reading waived (on 2nd reading) (39-Y 0-N) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Reported from Rules (Voice Vote) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Agreed to by House (57-Y 39-N) | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Engrossed by House | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Taken up | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Reported from Rules (11-Y 3-N) | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25101900D |