House | 03/19/2025 | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ558ER) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2025 | Agreed to by Senate | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Laid on Clerk's Desk | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Received | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Agreed to by House | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Engrossed by House | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Taken up for immediate consideration | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Passed by for the day February 13, 2025 | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 25104047D |