|
04/02/2025
|
Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0614)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Enacted, Chapter 614 (Effective 07/01/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Signed by President as reenrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reenrolled bill text (SB1056ER2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reenrolled
|
|
|
|
04/02/2025
|
Governor's recommendation adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
House concurred in Governor's recommendation (58-Y 37-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Governor's substitute printed (SB1056S2)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Governor's recommendation received by Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (SB1056)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1056ER)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2025
|
Conference report agreed to by House (51-Y 46-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2025
|
Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2025
|
Conference substitute printed 25107984D-S1
|
|
|
|
02/22/2025
|
Amended by conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Delegates: Lopez, Martinez, Morefield
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Conferees appointed by House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senators: Ebbin, McPike, Reeves
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Conferees appointed by Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
House requested conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
House insisted on amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
House Amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 35-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Passed House with amendments (49-Y 47-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Engrossed by House as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Labor and Commerce Amendments agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 3rd reading) (39-Y 1-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Read second time and engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) (38-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2025
|
Reported from Commerce and Labor and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-07-2025 25100535D
|
|
|