Virginia 2025 Regular Session

Virginia Senate Bill SB1301 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 2025 SESSION
22
3-SENATE SUBSTITUTE
3+INTRODUCED
44
5-25105540D
5+25101214D
66
77 SENATE BILL NO. 1301
88
9-AMENDMENT IN THE NATURE OF A SUBSTITUTE
10-
11-(Proposed by the Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor
12-
13-on January 20, 2025)
14-
15-(Patrons Prior to SubstituteSenators McPike and Reeves [SB 860])
9+Offered January 9, 2025
1610
1711 A BILL to amend and reenact 65.2-107 of the Code of Virginia, relating to workers' compensation benefits; post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder incurred by law-enforcement officers and firefighters.
12+
13+
14+
15+PatronMcPike
16+
17+
18+
19+Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
1820
1921
2022
2123 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of Virginia:
2224
2325 1. That 65.2-107 of the Code of Virginia is amended and reenacted as follows:
2426
2527 65.2-107. Post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder incurred by law-enforcement officers and firefighters.
2628
2729 A. As used in this section:
2830
2931 "Anxiety disorder" means a disorder that meets the diagnostic criteria for one or more of the anxiety disorders specified in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association.
3032
3133 "Depressive disorder" means a disorder that meets the diagnostic criteria for one or more of the depressive disorders specified in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association.
3234
3335 "Firefighter" means any (i) salaried firefighter, including special forest wardens designated pursuant to 10.1-1135, emergency medical services personnel, and local or state fire scene investigator and (ii) volunteer firefighter and volunteer emergency medical services personnel.
3436
3537 "In the line of duty" means any action that a law-enforcement officer or firefighter was obligated or authorized to perform by rule, regulation, written condition of employment service, or law.
3638
3739 "Law-enforcement officer" means any (i) member of the State Police Officers' Retirement System; (ii) member of a county, city, or town police department; (iii) sheriff or deputy sheriff; (iv) Department of Emergency Management hazardous materials officer; (v) city sergeant or deputy city sergeant of the City of Richmond; (vi) Virginia Marine Police officer; (vii) conservation police officer who is a full-time sworn member of the enforcement division of the Department of Wildlife Resources; (viii) Capitol Police officer; (ix) special agent of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority appointed under the provisions of Chapter 1 ( 4.1-100 et seq.) of Title 4.1; (x) for such period that the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority voluntarily subjects itself to the provisions of this chapter as provided in 65.2-305, officer of the police force established and maintained by the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority; (xi) officer of the police force established and maintained by the Norfolk Airport Authority; (xii) sworn officer of the police force established and maintained by the Virginia Port Authority; or (xiii) campus police officer appointed under Article 3 ( 23.1-809 et seq.) of Chapter 8 of Title 23.1 and employed by any public institution of higher education.
3840
3941 "Mental health professional" means a board-certified psychiatrist or a psychologist licensed pursuant to Title 54.1 who has experience diagnosing and treating post-traumatic stress disorder.
4042
4143 "Post-traumatic stress disorder" means a disorder that meets the diagnostic criteria for post-traumatic stress disorder as specified in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association.
4244
4345 "Qualifying event" means an incident or exposure occurring in the line of duty on or after July 1, 2020, for post-traumatic stress disorder, and for purposes of subdivisions 1 through 4 of this definition, on or after July 1, 2023, for anxiety disorder or depressive disorder:
4446
4547 1. Resulting in serious bodily injury or death to any person or persons;
4648
4749 2. Involving a minor who has been injured, killed, abused, or exploited;
4850
4951 3. Involving an immediate threat to life of the claimant or another individual;
5052
5153 4. Involving mass casualties; or
5254
5355 5. Responding to crime scenes for investigation.
5456
5557 B. Post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder incurred by a law-enforcement officer or firefighter is compensable under this title if:
5658
5759 1. A mental health professional examines a law-enforcement officer or firefighter and diagnoses the law-enforcement officer or firefighter as suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder as a result of the individual's undergoing a qualifying event;
5860
5961 2. The post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder resulted from the law-enforcement officer's or firefighter's acting in the line of duty and, in the case of a firefighter, such firefighter complied with federal Occupational Safety and Health Act standards adopted pursuant to 29 C.F.R. 1910.134 and 29 C.F.R. 1910.156;
6062
6163 3. The law-enforcement officer's or firefighter's undergoing a qualifying event was a substantial factor in causing his post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder;
6264
6365 4. Such qualifying event, and not another event or source of stress, was the primary cause of the post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder; and
6466
6567 5. The post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety disorder, or depressive disorder did not result from any disciplinary action, work evaluation, job transfer, layoff, demotion, promotion, termination, retirement, or similar action of the law-enforcement officer or firefighter.
6668
6769 Any such mental health professional shall comply with any workers' compensation guidelines for approved medical providers, including guidelines on release of past or contemporaneous medical records.
6870
6971 C. Notwithstanding any provision of this title, workers' compensation benefits for any law-enforcement officer or firefighter payable pursuant to this section shall (i) include any combination of medical treatment prescribed by a board-certified psychiatrist or a licensed psychologist, temporary total incapacity benefits under 65.2-500, and temporary partial incapacity benefits under 65.2-502 and (ii) be provided for a maximum of 52 weeks from the date of diagnosis. Workers' compensation benefits for anxiety disorder or depressive disorder of any law-enforcement officer or firefighter payable pursuant to this section shall be provided for a maximum of 104 weeks from the date of diagnosis. Workers' compensation benefits for post-traumatic stress disorder of any law-enforcement officer or firefighter payable pursuant to this section shall be provided for a maximum duration according to the provisions of 65.2-518. No medical treatment, temporary total incapacity benefits under 65.2-500, or temporary partial incapacity benefits under 65.2-502 shall be awarded beyond four years from the date of the qualifying event that formed the basis for the claim for benefits under this section. The weekly benefits received by a law-enforcement officer or a firefighter pursuant to 65.2-500 or 65.2-502, when combined with other benefits, including contributory and noncontributory retirement benefits, Social Security benefits, and benefits under a long-term or short-term disability plan, but not including payments for medical care, shall not exceed the average weekly wage paid to such law-enforcement officer or firefighter.
7072
7173 D. No later than January 1, 2021, each employer of law-enforcement officers or firefighters shall (i) make peer support available to such law-enforcement officers and firefighters and (ii) refer a law-enforcement officer or firefighter seeking mental health care services to a mental health professional.
7274
7375 E. Each fire basic training program conducted or administered by the Department of Fire Programs or a municipal fire department in the Commonwealth shall provide, in consultation with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, resilience and self-care technique training for any individual who begins basic training as a firefighter on or after July 1, 2021.