House | 02/18/2025 | Left in General Laws | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) | ||
House | 02/09/2025 | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Committee on General Laws | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Placed on Calendar | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Constitutional reading dispensed (on 3rd reading) (40-Y 0-N) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | General Laws and Technology Substitute agreed to | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Reading of substitute waived | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Read second time | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Passed by for the day | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (SB876) | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Committee substitute printed 25105052D-S1 | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) | ||
Senate | 01/03/2025 | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | ||
Senate | 01/03/2025 | Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25101521D |