House | 02/18/2025 | Left in Courts of Justice | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Placed on Calendar | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Printed as engrossed 25100120D-E | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Engrossed by Senate as amended | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Courts of Justice Amendments agreed to | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Reading of amendments waived | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Read second time | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Passed by for the day | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) (40-Y 0-N) | ||
Senate | 01/20/2025 | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 7-N) | ||
Senate | 01/05/2025 | Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25100120D |