|
03/24/2025
|
Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Approved by Governor-Chapter 404 (Effective 07/01/25)
|
|
|
|
02/20/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (SB920)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB920ER)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Passed House (94-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Placed on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 3rd reading) (39-Y 1-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Printed as engrossed 25102335D-E
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Engrossed by Senate as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Senator Salim, Saddam Azlan Amendment agreed to
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Reading of amendment waived
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) (38-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Reported from Commerce and Labor and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25102335D
|
|
|