Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate sustained Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/03/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 3, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB962ER)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (SB962)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 15-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Passed House with substitute with amendment (50-Y 47-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Engrossed by House - committee substitute as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Delegate Krizek Amendment Offered agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
General Laws Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25106838D-H1
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Committee on General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Placed on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
General Laws and Technology Substitute agreed to
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Reading of substitute waived
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) (38-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Committee substitute printed 25105779D-S1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 6-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2025
|
Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25103604D
|
|
|