|
04/02/2025
|
Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Enacted, Chapter 612 (Effective 07/01/2025 - see bill)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Signed by President as reenrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reenrolled bill text (SB999ER2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reenrolled
|
|
|
|
04/02/2025
|
Governor's recommendation adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Governor's substitute printed (SB999S1)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2025
|
Governor's recommendation received by Senate
|
|
|
|
03/11/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (SB999)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB999ER)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Passed House (97-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Assigned Courts sub: Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Placed on Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2025
|
Read second time and engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading) (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 3-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Reported from Courts of Justice and rereferred to Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-08-2025 25104339D
|
|
|