Virginia 2025 Regular Session

Virginia Senate Bill SJR257 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 2025 SESSION
22
3-ENROLLED
3+INTRODUCED
4+
5+25100004D
46
57 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION NO. 257
68
9+Offered January 8, 2025
10+
11+Prefiled January 7, 2025
12+
713 Celebrating the life of Dorothy Belle Scates Langmack.
814
9-Agreed to by the Senate, January 16, 2025
1015
11-Agreed to by the House of Delegates, January 20, 2025
16+
17+PatronStuart
1218
1319
1420
1521 WHEREAS, Dorothy Belle Scates Langmack, a devoted public servant and community leader in Westmoreland County, died on April 12, 2024; and
1622
1723 WHEREAS, Dorothy Belle Langmack was born to the late Cary Malcolm and Dorothy Belle Leutbecher Scates in Washington, D.C., where she attended Theodore Roosevelt High School; and
1824
1925 WHEREAS, Dorothy Belle Langmack continued her education at Hood College in Frederick, Maryland, then settled in the Northern Neck; and
2026
2127 WHEREAS, Dorothy Belle Langmack served her community as a former member of the Montross Town Council and was active in Westmoreland County Public Schools as a substitute teacher and an avid supporter of student athletics; she ultimately finished her career with the Westmoreland County Department of Social Services; and
2228
2329 WHEREAS, Dorothy Belle Langmack gave generously of her time and talents to help the less fortunate, and she played an instrumental role in the establishment and operation of the Bob Fox Christmas Box project; and
2430
2531 WHEREAS, Dorothy Belle Langmack enjoyed fellowship and worship with the Westmoreland community as a devout member of Nomini Baptist Church; and
2632
27-WHEREAS, predeceased by her husband, Holger Christian Petersen Langmack, Jr., Dorothy Belle Langmack will be fondly remembered and greatly missed by her children, David Malcolm Blair, Betty Lee Blair, John Edward Lewis, Jr., Kenneth Madison Lewis, and Malcolm Scates Lewis, and their families; and by numerous other family members and friends; now, therefore, be it
33+WHEREAS, predeceased by her husband, Holger Christian Petersen Langmack, Jr., Dorothy Belle Langmack will be fondly remembered and greatly missed by her children, David Malcolm Blair, Betty Lee Blair, John Edward Lewis, Jr., Kenneth Madison Lewis, and Malcolm Scates Lewis, and their families and by numerous other family members and friends; now, therefore, be it
2834
2935 RESOLVED by the Senate, the House of Delegates concurring, That the General Assembly hereby note with great sadness the loss of Dorothy Belle Scates Langmack; and, be it
3036
3137 RESOLVED FURTHER, That the Clerk of the Senate prepare a copy of this resolution for presentation to the family of Dorothy Belle Scates Langmack as an expression of the General Assembly's respect for her memory.