Virginia 2025 Regular Session

Virginia Senate Bill SR199 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 2025 SESSION
22
3-ENROLLED
3+INTRODUCED
4+
5+25100554D
46
57 SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 199
68
9+Offered January 8, 2025
10+
11+Prefiled January 8, 2025
12+
713 Commending David W. Poole.
814
9-Agreed to by the Senate, January 16, 2025
15+
16+
17+PatronJordan
1018
1119
1220
1321 WHEREAS, David W. Poole, a distinguished veteran, beloved community leader, and respected vice president of the former Virginia Electric and Power Company celebrated his 100th birthday in 2024; and
1422
1523 WHEREAS, born on November 11, 1924, in Sussex County near Stony Creek, David Poole worked on a survey crew for the Virginia Department of Highways, now the Virginia Department of Transportation, before he was called to serve his country during World War II; and
1624
1725 WHEREAS, David Poole was inducted into the United States Army Air Forces on April 13, 1943, and was assigned to the 442nd Troop Carrier Group of the Ninth Air Force in the European Theater of Operations from March 1944 to 1945; and
1826
1927 WHEREAS, upon arrival in England, David Poole and the 442nd Troop Carrier Group began intensive training for the planned D-Day invasion of Normandy, France; and
2028
2129 WHEREAS, on June 6, 1944, prior to the first landings of seaborne forces, David Poole and his fellow members of the 442nd Troop Carrier Group dropped paratroopers near Sainte-Mre-glise, for which they were awarded the Presidential Unit Citation; and
2230
2331 WHEREAS, flying the venerable Douglas C-47 Skytrain, David Poole also evacuated wounded soldiers and hauled supplies to the front lines; he accumulated roughly 300 hours in the air and participated in seven campaigns, including the liberation of northern and southern France and the Battle of the Bulge; and
2432
2533 WHEREAS, after his honorable military service, David Poole returned to civilian life and played professional baseball as a member of the Portsmouth Cubs in the Piedmont League from 1947 to 1949; he subsequently graduated from Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University with a bachelor's degree in agricultural engineering in 1950; and
2634
2735 WHEREAS, David Poole had a long and productive career with the Virginia Electric and Power Company, commonly known as VEPCO, which is now part of Dominion Energy; he held numerous leadership roles over the course of more than 35 years, including as the first general manager of the Central Division in Richmond and later as one of the company's vice presidents; and
2836
2937 WHEREAS, David Poole has been a leader in every aspect of his life and a strong community supporter who has gone above and beyond to enhance the lives of others through his generosity and commitment to service; he has volunteered his wisdom to many local organizations and is a devout member of the Methodist church; and
3038
3139 WHEREAS, David Poole enjoyed many happy years of marriage with his late wife, Charlotte Winfield Poole, and he continues to be blessed with the love and admiration of his daughter, Cheryl P. Umbach, and her husband, Art; his son, Stephen R. Poole; and numerous other family members and friends; now, therefore, be it
3240
3341 RESOLVED by the Senate of Virginia, That David W. Poole, an honored veteran and cherished member of the Sussex County community, hereby be commended on the occasion of his 100th birthday; and, be it
3442
3543 RESOLVED FURTHER, That the Clerk of the Senate prepare a copy of this resolution for presentation to David W. Poole as an expression of the Senate of Virginia's admiration for his lifetime of service to the Commonwealth and the nation.