Virginia 2025 Regular Session

Virginia Senate Bill SR205 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/15/2025

                            2025 SESSION

ENROLLED

SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 205

Nominating persons to be elected to circuit court judgeships.

Agreed to by the Senate, January 14, 2025

 

RESOLVED by the Senate of Virginia, That the following persons are hereby nominated to be elected to the respective circuit court judgeships as follows:

The Honorable William Edward Tomko, III, of Sussex, as a judge of the Sixth Judicial Circuit for a term of eight years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Christopher R. Papile, of Newport News, as a judge of the Seventh Judicial Circuit for a term of eight years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable David A. Oblon, of Fairfax City, as a judge of the Nineteenth Judicial Circuit for a term of eight years commencing January 1, 2026.

The Honorable James R. Swanson, of Roanoke County, as a judge of the Twenty-third Judicial Circuit for a term of eight years commencing April 1, 2025.