10 | 20 | | |
---|
11 | 21 | | |
---|
12 | 22 | | |
---|
13 | 23 | | RESOLVED by the Senate of Virginia, That the following persons are hereby nominated to be elected to the respective juvenile and domestic relations district court judgeships as follows: |
---|
14 | 24 | | |
---|
15 | 25 | | The Honorable Lori B. Galbraith, of Chesapeake, as a judge of the First Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
16 | 26 | | |
---|
17 | 27 | | The Honorable Cheshire I'Anson Eveleigh, of Virginia Beach, as a judge of the Second Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
18 | 28 | | |
---|
19 | 29 | | The Honorable Timothy J. Quick, of Virginia Beach, as a judge of the Second Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
20 | 30 | | |
---|
21 | 31 | | The Honorable Lauri D. Hogge, of Norfolk, as a judge of the Fourth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
22 | 32 | | |
---|
23 | 33 | | The Honorable Devon R. Paige Charity, of Norfolk, as a judge of the Fourth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
24 | 34 | | |
---|
25 | 35 | | The Honorable Christopher B. Ackerman, of Brunswick, as a judge of the Sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
26 | 36 | | |
---|
27 | 37 | | The Honorable Rebecca M. Robinson, of Newport News, as a judge of the Seventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 16, 2025. |
---|
28 | 38 | | |
---|
29 | 39 | | The Honorable Jeffrey C. Rountree, of Newport News, as a judge of the Seventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
30 | 40 | | |
---|
31 | 41 | | The Honorable Gregory C. Bane, of Hampton, as a judge of the Eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
32 | 42 | | |
---|
33 | 43 | | The Honorable Jay Edward Dugger, of Hampton, as a judge of the Eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
34 | 44 | | |
---|
35 | 45 | | The Honorable Robert B. Wilson, V, of Hampton, as a judge of the Eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
36 | 46 | | |
---|
37 | 47 | | The Honorable Phillip T. DiStanislao, Jr., of Petersburg, as a judge of the Eleventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing February 1, 2025. |
---|
38 | 48 | | |
---|
39 | 49 | | The Honorable Theresa J. Royall, of Nottoway, as a judge of the Eleventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
40 | 50 | | |
---|
41 | 51 | | The Honorable Brice E. Lambert, of Richmond, as a judge of the Thirteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
42 | 52 | | |
---|
43 | 53 | | The Honorable Joseph A. Vance, IV, of Fredericksburg, as a judge of the Fifteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
44 | 54 | | |
---|
45 | 55 | | The Honorable Barbara G. Lowe, of Albemarle, as a judge of the Sixteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
46 | 56 | | |
---|
47 | 57 | | The Honorable Maha-Rebekah R. Abejuela, of Fairfax County, as a judge of the Nineteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
48 | 58 | | |
---|
49 | 59 | | The Honorable Kimberly R. Belongia, of Henry, as a judge of the Twenty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
50 | 60 | | |
---|
51 | 61 | | The Honorable Stephanie M. Ayers, of Bedford, as a judge of the Twenty-fourth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
52 | 62 | | |
---|
53 | 63 | | The Honorable Jennifer E. Stille, of Lynchburg, as a judge of the Twenty-fourth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
54 | 64 | | |
---|
55 | 65 | | The Honorable Susan B. Read, of Staunton, as a judge of the Twenty-fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
56 | 66 | | |
---|
57 | 67 | | The Honorable Rachel E. Figura, of Rockingham, as a judge of the Twenty-sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025. |
---|
58 | 68 | | |
---|
59 | 69 | | The Honorable Chad A. Logan, of Shenandoah, as a judge of the Twenty-sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
60 | 70 | | |
---|
61 | 71 | | The Honorable Kimberly Michelle Jenkins, of Scott, as a judge of the Thirtieth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
62 | 72 | | |
---|
63 | 73 | | The Honorable Lisa Michelle Baird, of Manassas, as a judge of the Thirty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|