Virginia 2025 Regular Session

Virginia Senate Bill SR291 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 2025 SESSION
22
3-ENROLLED
3+INTRODUCED
4+
5+25107819D
46
57 SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 291
68
9+Offered February 19, 2025
10+
711 Nominating persons to be elected to general district court judgeships.
812
9-Agreed to by the Senate, February 19, 2025
13+
14+
15+PatronSurovell
16+
17+
18+
19+Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
1020
1121
1222
1323 RESOLVED by the Senate of Virginia, That the following persons are hereby nominated to be elected to the respective general district court judgeships as follows:
1424
1525 Derek A. Wagner, Esquire, of Chesapeake, as a judge of the First Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025.
1626
1727 James Matthew Haynes, Jr., Esquire, of Northampton, as a judge of the Judicial District 2-A for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025.
1828
1929 Vaughn T. Breedlove, Esquire, of Suffolk, as a judge of the Fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025.
2030
2131 William S. Newsome, Esquire, of Emporia, as a judge of the Sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025.
2232
2333 Shukita L. Massey, Esquire, of Newport News, as a judge of the Eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025.
2434
2535 James Anderson Mullins, Esquire, of York, as a judge of the Ninth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.
2636
2737 Brian H. Jones, Esquire, of Powhatan, as a judge of the Eleventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.
2838
2939 Jennifer E. S. Rosen, Esquire, of Richmond, as a judge of the Thirteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.
3040
3141 Adam M. Krischer, Esquire, of Arlington, as a judge of the Seventeenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.
3242
3343 Raymond J. Obregon, Esquire, of Fairfax County, as a judge of the Nineteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025.
3444
3545 Suzan E. Moore, Esquire, of Washington, as a judge of the Twenty-eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 16, 2025.
3646
3747 Fernando Villarroel, Esquire, of Fairfax, as a judge of the Thirty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.