Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill H0013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025
Fiscal Note February 14, 2025
Bill December 30, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2025