Vermont 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont Senate Bill S0127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 8, 2025
Fiscal Note March 25, 2025
Fiscal Note March 20, 2025
Bill March 17, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2025