House | 03/19/2025 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | ||
House | 03/09/2025 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Minority; do not pass. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | CS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety at 8:00 AM. | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety at 1:30 PM. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading, referred to Community Safety. | ||
House | 01/07/2025 | Prefiled for introduction. |