House
|
04/27/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2025
|
House concurred in Senate amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2025
|
Committee amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
WM - Majority; do pass with amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Minority; do not pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2025
|
First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 3.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
2nd substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2025
|
Prefiled for introduction.
|
|
|