House
|
04/16/2025
|
Effective date 7/27/2025.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Chapter 61, 2025 Laws.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
EDU - Majority; do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2025
|
First reading, referred to Education.
|
|
|