House | 03/19/2025 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Minority; do not pass. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | CPB - Majority; do pass. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |