House | 02/21/2025 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Minority; do not pass. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | First reading, referred to Local Government. |