House
|
04/16/2025
|
Effective date 7/27/2025.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Chapter 67, 2025 Laws.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
LGV - Majority; do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
First reading, referred to Local Government.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Vote on third reading will be reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Returned to second reading for amendment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2025
|
Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|