House
|
04/21/2025
|
Effective date 7/27/2025.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Chapter 97, 2025 Laws.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
HLTC - Majority; do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
|
|
|