House
|
04/25/2025
|
Effective date 4/25/2025*.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Chapter 169, 2025 Laws.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 3.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2025
|
House concurred in Senate amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Minority; do not pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
HS - Majority; do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
First reading, referred to Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
|
|
|