House
|
04/24/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2025
|
House concurred in Senate amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Committee amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2025
|
First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
CS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety at 4:00 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
First reading, referred to Community Safety.
|
|
|