House
|
04/25/2025
|
Effective date 7/27/2025.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Chapter 170, 2025 Laws.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
LC - Majority; do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2025
|
Minority; do not pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
|
|
|