House
|
04/24/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 71; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
House concurred in Senate amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Committee amendment not adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Minority; do not pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
First reading, referred to Transportation.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:00 PM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
|
|
|