House
|
04/27/2025
|
By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2025
|
First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2025
|
Minority; do not pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2025
|
APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
First reading, referred to Appropriations.
|
|
|