Senate | 02/03/2025 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Ways & Means. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | And refer to Ways & Means. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | SGTE - Majority; do pass. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Affairs & Elections at 10:30 AM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Affairs & Elections at 10:30 AM. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Affairs & Elections. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2024 | Prefiled for introduction. |