Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Senate concurred in House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Committee amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
ED - Majority; do pass with amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
First reading, referred to Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Placed on second reading consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2024
|
Prefiled for introduction.
|
|
|