Senate
|
05/12/2025
|
Effective date 7/27/2025.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2025
|
Chapter 224, 2025 Laws.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2025
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Senate concurred in House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Committee amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2025
|
Prefiled for introduction.
|
|
|