Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2025
|
Senate concurred in House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
APP - Majority; do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM in anticipation of other legislative action.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Minority; do not pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM in anticipation of other legislative action.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
First reading, referred to Appropriations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2025
|
WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Referred to Ways & Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
And refer to Ways & Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
HS - Majority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
First reading, referred to Human Services.
|
|
|