Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Senate concurred in House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Committee amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
CPB - Majority; do pass with amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
BFT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
|
|
|