Senate | 03/17/2025 | Senate Rules "X" file. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Minority; without recommendation. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | HSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | First reading, referred to Housing. |