Senate
|
04/27/2025
|
Delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2025
|
Senate concurred in House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Committee amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
TR - Majority; do pass with amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Minority; without recommendation.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Minority; do not pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
First reading, referred to Transportation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2025
|
Floor amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2025
|
Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM in anticipation of other legislative action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM in anticipation of other legislative action.
|
|
|