Senate
|
04/27/2025
|
By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Referred to Rules 2 Review.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
TR - Majority; do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
First reading, referred to Transportation.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
1st substitute bill substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Placed on second reading consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/23/2024
|
Prefiled for introduction.
|
|
|