Senate | 03/17/2025 | Senate Rules "X" file. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Minority; without recommendation. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |