House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:52 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 5 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 5 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hurd | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced |