House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced |