Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 2 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced |